Greenwald, Iris Cindy (CPSO#: 69100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A &B
14 Nelson Street West
Brampton ON  L6X 1B7
Phone: (905) 450-6679
Fax: (905) 450-7741
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

175 Commerce Valley Drive west
Suite 300
Markham ON  L3T 7P6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

14 Nelson Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 1M2
Canada
Phone: (905) 450-6679
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I. Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Greenwald ( CPSO# 69100 )

Business Address:
Unit A & B
14 Nelson Street West
Brampton ON  L6X 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 450-6679

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRIS CINDY GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997