Greer-Bayramoglu, Rebecca Jane (CPSO#: 88335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15 Elizabeth Street
Unit M10
Orangeville ON  L9W 3X3
Phone: (519) 942-2222
Fax: (519) 341-1579
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

1 Elizabeth street
suite 100
Orangeville ON  L9W7N7
Canada
Phone: 519-938-8000
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Greer-Bayramoglu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Greer-Bayramoglu ( CPSO# 88335 )

Business Address:
Unit M10
15 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 3X3
Phone Number: (519) 942-2222

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA JANE GREER-BAYRAMOGLU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREER-BAYRAMOGLU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2013