Gregg, Richard William (CPSO#: 56023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of
Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2630
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Gregg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2006

Dr. R. Gregg ( CPSO# 56023 )

Business Address:
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2630

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 06 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM GREGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989