Gregoire, Jocelyn (CPSO#: 70957)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 1997