Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gregoire, Keith Ronald (CPSO#: 67792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suites 303 & 305
274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 779-7575
Fax: (613) 779-8686
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Susie's Place
487 Baptist Church Road
Stirling ON  K0K 1E0
Canada
Phone: 613-395-3742
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: 613-548-3232
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 613-544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Lennox & Addington General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Canada
Phone: 613-354-3301 Ext. 202
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Quinte Healthcare (BGH)
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: 613-969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Gregoire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gregoire ( CPSO# 67792 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Watkins 3, Room 304
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-5511

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington Country General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
487 Baptist Church Road
Stirling ON  K0K 3E0
Phone Number: (613) 395-3742

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH RONALD GREGOIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGOIRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998