Gregoire, Sylvie (CPSO#: 50776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82197
Fax: (613) 738-8206
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sylvie Gregoire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gregoire ( CPSO# 50776 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIE GREGOIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGOIRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1987