Gregory, Thomas William (CPSO#: 106432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department of Physical Medicine &
Rehabilitation
752 King st West
Kingston ON  K7L 5A2
Phone: 613 5444900
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS WILLIAM GREGORY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GREGORY is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. GREGORY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GREGORY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GREGORY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GREGORY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GREGORY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018