Gregson, Daniel Brian (CPSO#: 52629)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001