Greig, Anita Rani Arya (CPSO#: 59763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: Arya, Anita Rani (used until: 28 Aug 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
343 Wilson Avenue
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone: (416) 785-8412
Fax: (416) 785-8324
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Family Medicine Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5159
Fax: (416) 586-3175
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA RANI ARYA GREIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREIG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1989