Greig, David Herbert (CPSO#: 22092)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012