Greisman, Bernard (CPSO#: 25531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentina Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone: (905) 785-3627
Fax: (905) 785-3628
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Well Medica
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Canada
Phone: (289) 371-3030
Fax: (289) 371-3330
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

FountainMedical and Wellness Centre
Unit U14
9425 Leslie Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N7
Canada
Phone: (416) 642-5932
Fax: (905) 737-4773
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

14872 YONGE ST
ENHANCED MEDICAL CENTER-AURORA
Aurora ON  L4J 1N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 505-0950
Fax: (905) 841-9404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

JANE FINCH MALL
3869 JANE ST
Downsview ON  M3N 2K1
Canada
Phone: (416) 636-7077
Fax: (416) 635-0562
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

385 SILVER STAR BLVD., UNIT # 113
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Canada
Phone: 416 551 2888
Fax: 416 792 7888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

90 RESOLTION DRIVE, UNIT 2
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 883-3877
Fax: 8553202591
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

MCI The Doctors Office
Main Exchange Site
800 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 7L2
Canada
Phone: (905) 738-6699
Fax: (905) 738-6073
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

MCI The Doctors Office
Morningside Crossing
255 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1E 3E6
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-1020
Fax: (416) 284-1271
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients must contact the clinic at which they were seen
Date Received: 01 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD GREISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREISMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Jan 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008