Grenier, Benoit (CPSO#: 62038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHUS - Hotel Dieu
580 Bowen Sud
Sherbrooke QC  J1G 2E8
Phone: (819) 346-1110
Fax: (819) 822-6795
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CSSS de Memphrémagog
50 St-Patrice est
magog QC  J1X 3X3
Canada
Phone: (819) 843-2292
Fax: (819) 868-3258
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENOIT GRENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRENIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994