Grenier, Jodi Leigh (CPSO#: 59494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga L5B 1B8
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominic Rosso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grenier ( CPSO# 59494 )
Dr. D. Rosso ( CPSO# 62250 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7549

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODI LEIGH GRENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRENIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989