Grennan, Jonathan Troy (CPSO#: 82592)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: BC Centre for Disease Control 655 West 12th Avenue Vancouver BC V6Z 2N1
Date Received: 16 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 21 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015