Grewal, Anita (CPSO#: 75253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Phone: (905) 845-9293
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grewal ( CPSO# 75253 )

Business Address:
165 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2W8
Phone Number: (905) 523-8800

Business Address:
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Phone Number: (905) 845-9623

Business Address:
8500 McLaughlin Road South
Brampton ON  L6Y 0N6
Phone Number: (905) 454-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002