Grewal, Jasmine (CPSO#: 78878)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2003 to 25 Apr 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2003 to 29 Aug 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010