Grewal, Karen Kaur (CPSO#: 90514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3547
Fax: (613) 548-1368
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen K. Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grewal ( CPSO# 90514 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013