Grewal, Puneet Kaur (CPSO#: 79691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 335-4616
Fax: (905) 637-1543
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2025 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7P 4M8
Canada
Phone: (905) 681-7755
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Grewal ( CPSO# 79691 )

Business Address:
Burlington Professional Centre
206 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 335-4616

Business Address:
2025 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7P 4M8
Phone Number: (905) 681-7755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNEET KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005