Grewal, Ruby Ravinder (CPSO#: 78511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Roth|McFarlane
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 646-6286
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruby Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Grewal ( CPSO# 78511 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Hand and Upper Limb Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
D0-215
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6286

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBY RAVINDER GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004