Grieci, Tanya (CPSO#: 90499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit S102
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone: (905) 528-8747
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Grieci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Grieci ( CPSO# 90499 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 528-8747

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA GRIECI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIECI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2011