Grief, Cindy Joanne (CPSO#: 69099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 3070
Fax: (416) 785-2450
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. E. Albert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Grief ( CPSO# 69099 )
Dr. S. Albert ( CPSO# 55696 )

Business Address:
1929 Bayveiw Avenue
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 580-5590

Business Address:
Baycrest Geriatric Health Care System
3560 Bathurst Street
4C91D
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY JOANNE GRIEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIEF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000