Griffin, Ann Priscilla (CPSO#: 55778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Water Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1P8
Phone: (519) 426-1333
Fax: (519) 426-1555
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

east brant clinic
423 colbourne St
Brantford ON  N3S 3N5
Canada
Phone: 519 756-1741
Fax: (519 756 2017
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

vista Health clinic
847 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 3B4
Canada
Phone: (905) 544 5255
Fax: (905) 544 5155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 1, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 13, 2011, Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance notified the College that Dr. Ann P. Griffin's privileges were revoked, effective August 9, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 19 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 19, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ann Priscilla
            Griffin, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Griffin to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Pursuant to her undertaking with the College, Dr. Griffin shall not
                  engage in the administration of inhaled or intravenous anaesthesia, or of
                  spinal or epidural anaesthesia in the context of surgical procedures,
                  except to the extent necessary to complete a preceptorship on the basis
                  set out in her undertaking.  The undertaking does not affect Dr.
                  Griffin's practice in pain management, which does not involve the
                  administration of inhaled or intravenous anaesthesia, or the
                  administration of spinal or epidural anaesthesia in the context of
                  surgical procedures.