Griffin, Glenn Herbert (CPSO#: 32577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte West Medical Centre
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone: (613) 394-0770 Ext. 4
Fax: (613) 480-6587
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Glenn Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Griffin ( CPSO# 32577 )

Business Address:
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone Number: (613) 394-4620

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN HERBERT GRIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002