Griffin, Griselda Kathleen (CPSO#: 25289)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients can call medical records manager at Humer River Hospital and get a copy of anaesthetic record
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017