Griffin, Steven Richard (CPSO#: 82923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
19 Oak Street
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-1565
Fax: (613) 332-0526
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Healthcare North Hastings
PO Box 157
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2825
Fax: (613) 332-3847
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven R. Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Griffin ( CPSO# 82923 )

Business Address:
Bancroft Family Health Team
19 Oak Street
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-1565

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care North Hastings
1H Manor
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN RICHARD GRIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007