Griffin, Wendy Anne (CPSO#: 61018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 205
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-8144
Fax: (905) 820-1631
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Griffin ( CPSO# 61018 )

Business Address:
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 205
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-8144

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ANNE GRIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990