Griffioen, Timothy (CPSO#: 62137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Franklin Medical Clinic
1150 Franklin Blvd.
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone: (519) 620-7044
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Griffioen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Griffioen ( CPSO# 62137 )

Business Address:
Franklin Medical Clinic
1-1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone Number: (519) 620-7044

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY GRIFFIOEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFIOEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 6, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)