Griffiths, Frances Anne Harrington (CPSO#: 24266)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: Harrington Griffiths, Frances Anne (used until: 18 Mar 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2006