Griffiths, Gregory Blake (CPSO#: 58694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
532 Lake Street
Suite 104
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone: (905) 935-4949
Fax: (905) 937-4242
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.B. Griffiths Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Griffiths ( CPSO# 58694 )

Business Address:
104 - 532 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone Number: (905) 935-4949

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY BLAKE GRIFFITHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFITHS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1987