Griffiths, Lesley Anne (CPSO#: 77590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Third Ave
Suite 250
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave. E.
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: (705) 268-7444
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lesley Anne Griffiths Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Griffiths ( CPSO# 77590 )

Business Address:
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEY ANNE GRIFFITHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFITHS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004