Grigenas, Orest (CPSO#: 82722)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013