Grigg, Megan Jean (CPSO#: 84376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Turner, Megan Jean (used until: 31 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N0H 2T0
Phone: (519) 534-1700
Fax: (519) 534-1744
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Megan Grigg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grigg ( CPSO# 84376 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N0H 2T0
Phone Number: (519) 534-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN JEAN GRIGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010