Grigoriadis, Sophie (CPSO#: 71335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Room FG29
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 5677
Fax: (416) 480-6878
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grigoriadis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grigoriadis ( CPSO# 71335 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Room FG 29
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIE GRIGORIADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGORIADIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002