Grills, Gordon Ross (CPSO#: 32122)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1990