Grimard, Laval Jacques (CPSO#: 52592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70194
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laval Grimard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Grimard ( CPSO# 52592 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 04 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAVAL JACQUES GRIMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIMARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1989