Grimes, David Andrew (CPSO#: 65508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital -- Civic Campus
Division of Neurology - C2
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18162
Fax: 613-761-5360
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.A. Grimes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Grimes ( CPSO# 65508 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus - Division of Neurology
C2 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5353

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW GRIMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIMES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993