Grimes, John David (CPSO#: 22478)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2000