Grimes, Valentine Sebastian (CPSO#: 74466)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cambridge, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004