Grimmer, Joanne (CPSO#: 71420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital-LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8379
Fax: (519) 685-8156
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Grimmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grimmer ( CPSO# 71420 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital - LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B1-168
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE GRIMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIMMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2002