Grimshaw, Robert Norman (CPSO#: 54169)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989