Grise, Ann Denise (CPSO#: 31451)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: University Health Network Medical Records 200 Elizabeth St Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Dec 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017