Grisoli, Dominique Jean Augustin (CPSO#: 87901)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aix-Marseille II, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2007 to 03 Jan 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008