Grober, Ethan Daniel (CPSO#: 73894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Murray Koffler Urologic Wellness
Centre 6th Floor Box 19
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5374
Fax: (416) 586-4823
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Department of Ambulatory Surgery
Office 8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grober Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Grober ( CPSO# 73894 )
Dr. L. Roth ( CPSO# 74575 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Murray Koffler Urologic Wellness
6th Floor, PO Box 19
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Ambulatory Surgery
76 Grenville Street
8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ETHAN DANIEL GROBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2007