Grodecki, Anna Maria (CPSO#: 80777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Environmental
Medicine Establishment
1133 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3K 2C9
Phone: (416) 635-2000 Ext. 2014
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA GRODECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRODECKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013