Groenewoud, Yolanda Alice (CPSO#: 58537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
474 College Streeet
Unit 404
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone: (416) 920-3933
Fax: (416) 920-4814
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y.A. Groenewoud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Groenewoud ( CPSO# 58537 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
474 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 920-3933

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOLANDA ALICE GROENEWOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROENEWOUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988