Grof, Paul (CPSO#: 33809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
Suite 302
1 Nicholas Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 7B7
Phone: (613) 564-3950 Ext. 296
Fax: (613) 526-3092
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 979-6868
Fax: (416) 979-6821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GROF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1982