Groh, Catherine Daisy (CPSO#: 70283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 461-8882
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE DAISY GROH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998