Groll, Ryan Jeffrey (CPSO#: 77930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 303
855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3Z1
Phone: (416) 461-7170
Fax: (416) 461-7171
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN JEFFREY GROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROLL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009