Gronau, Karen Ann (CPSO#: 72593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2130 North Park Drive
Suite 234
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 789-8966
Fax: (905) 789-6642
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Gronau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gronau ( CPSO# 72593 )

Business Address:
2130 North Park Drive
Suite 234
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 789-8966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN GRONAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRONAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2009