Grondin, Fernande Marie Helene (CPSO#: 45460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Service de Sante
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
5457-1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 715-5827
Fax: (613) 715-5839
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERNANDE MARIE HELENE GRONDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRONDIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 28 Feb 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988